MA H2177 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4432
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4432
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4432
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require mobile data wireless carriers and in-vehicle security and communications providers to provide locator information to law enforcement agencies. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Relative to locating missing persons via mobile data
Sponsors
Rep. Shaunna O'Connell [R] | Rep. Kimberly Ferguson [R] | Rep. Colleen Garry [D] | Rep. Randy Hunt [R] |
Rep. Robert Koczera [D] | Rep. Todd Smola [R] | Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-28 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4432 |
2014-01-31 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/11/2014 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-04-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/04/2013 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
H4432 (Replaced by) 2014-08-28 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H2177 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H2177.pdf |