MA H2185 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to establishing veterans’ housing preferences. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
Relative to veterans housing advantage
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2021-12-16 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2021-12-16 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-12-16 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2021-12-13 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2021-07-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/27/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H3809 (Similar To) 2021-12-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 97 of the Acts of 2021
H3891 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2470 (Similar To) 2021-10-05 - Amendment (as recommended by the committee on Senate Ways and Means) adopted
S2471 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H4059 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4083 (Similar To) 2022-01-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 4 of the Acts of 2022
H1376 (Similar To) 2022-04-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4686
S2112 (Similar To) 2022-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2401 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2680
S2419 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3722 (Similar To) 2022-06-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 73 of the Acts of 2022
S884 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2398 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2921 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S995 (Similar To) 2022-02-28 - Accompanied H1829
S895 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S402 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2650
S36 (Similar To) 2021-06-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2470
S878 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S879 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S882 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S1808 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3661 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S905 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
H3891 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2470 (Similar To) 2021-10-05 - Amendment (as recommended by the committee on Senate Ways and Means) adopted
S2471 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H4059 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4083 (Similar To) 2022-01-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 4 of the Acts of 2022
H1376 (Similar To) 2022-04-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4686
S2112 (Similar To) 2022-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2401 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2680
S2419 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3722 (Similar To) 2022-06-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 73 of the Acts of 2022
S884 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2398 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2921 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S995 (Similar To) 2022-02-28 - Accompanied H1829
S895 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S402 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2650
S36 (Similar To) 2021-06-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2470
S878 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S879 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S882 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S1808 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3661 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S905 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2185 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2185.pdf |