MA H2189 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 57 of the Acts of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 57 of the Acts of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the city known as the town of Greenfield be authorized to lease a certain parcel of land on Leyden Road in said town. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the city of Greenfield to lease a certain parcel of land
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-30 - Senate - Senate Enacted Roll Call #77 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-23 - House - House Enacted - 159 YEAS to 0 NAYS (Y: 159 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-23 - House - House Enacted - 159 YEAS to 0 NAYS (Y: 159 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-08 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 57 of the Acts of 2021 | |
2021-09-30 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2021-09-30 | Senate | Enacted -see Roll Call #77 (Yeas 38 to Nays 0) |
2021-09-23 | House | Enacted - 159 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 91 ) |
2021-08-19 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2021-08-19 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2021-07-15 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2021-07-14 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2021-06-21 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2021-06-21 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-06-21 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2021-06-15 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2021-06-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/08/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H3188 (Similar To) 2021-07-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3994
H3217 (Similar To) 2022-06-21 - New draft substituted, see H4901
H3163 (Similar To) 2021-09-27 - New draft substituted, see H4126
H3867 (Similar To) 2022-03-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 30 of the Acts of 2022
H3972 (Similar To) 2021-09-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 49 of the Acts of 2021
H4098 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1358 (Similar To) 2021-07-29 - New draft substituted, see S2503
S2064 (Similar To) 2022-07-29 - New draft substituted, see S3073
S1366 (Similar To) 2021-07-15 - Accompanied H3867
H3217 (Similar To) 2022-06-21 - New draft substituted, see H4901
H3163 (Similar To) 2021-09-27 - New draft substituted, see H4126
H3867 (Similar To) 2022-03-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 30 of the Acts of 2022
H3972 (Similar To) 2021-09-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 49 of the Acts of 2021
H4098 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1358 (Similar To) 2021-07-29 - New draft substituted, see S2503
S2064 (Similar To) 2022-07-29 - New draft substituted, see S3073
S1366 (Similar To) 2021-07-15 - Accompanied H3867