MA H2196 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4778
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Ms. Peisch of Wellesley, a petition of Alice Hanlon Peisch that the Attorney General promulgate regulations to create a standard disclosure form for residential real estate sales. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to real estate disclosure forms
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-18 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4778 |
2017-09-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/25/2017 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H945 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H2595 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H4778 (Replaced by) 2018-07-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2595 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H4778 (Replaced by) 2018-07-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2196 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2196.pdf |