MA H2214 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4722
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-3)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to public retiree cost-of-living adjustment financing. Public Service.
Title
Relative to public retiree COLA financing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-20 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4722 |
2019-09-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H2232 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H67 (Similar To) 2019-10-11 - Hearing scheduled for 10/21/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
H2158 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2321 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S1578 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1536 (Similar To) 2020-05-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2203 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1543 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1487 (Similar To) 2020-07-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2798
H4722 (Replaced by) 2020-05-20 - Reported, in part, by H2169
H67 (Similar To) 2019-10-11 - Hearing scheduled for 10/21/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
H2158 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2321 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S1578 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1536 (Similar To) 2020-05-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2203 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1543 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1487 (Similar To) 2020-07-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2798
H4722 (Replaced by) 2020-05-20 - Reported, in part, by H2169
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2214 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2214.pdf |