MA H2215 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to Group Insurance Commission dental and vision benefits for municipal employees. Public Service.
Title
Relative to GIC dental and vision benefits for municipal employees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-22 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-04-29 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-03-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-03-23 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-24 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2020-02-24 | House | Accompanied by S1548 |
2019-07-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/25/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H2503 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
S1548 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied H2215
S1045 (Similar To) 2020-11-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2936
H1681 (Similar To) 2020-12-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H5140
H3631 (Similar To) 2019-10-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 87 of the Acts of 2019
S1548 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied H2215
S1045 (Similar To) 2020-11-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2936
H1681 (Similar To) 2020-12-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H5140
H3631 (Similar To) 2019-10-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 87 of the Acts of 2019
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2215 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2215.pdf |