MA H2218 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to operations or governance structure changes of healthcare service providers or provider organizations and the review of such changes by the Attorney General. Health Care Financing.
Title
Relative to protecting health care consumers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-05-29 | House | Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the the committee on House Ways and Means |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-04-24 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 16, 2018, pending concurrence |
2018-03-01 | House | House concurred |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Wednesday April 25, 2018, pending concurrence |
2017-05-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/06/2017 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
S1193 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2422
H618 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
S513 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H1028 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4729
H530 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H495 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H2175 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H618 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
S513 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H1028 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4729
H530 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H495 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H2175 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2218 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2218.pdf |