MA H222 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the education of children under the care and custody of the Department of Children and Families. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Providing educational stability for vulnerable children
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-03-17 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2022-01-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/27/2022 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
H188 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4893
H257 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4905
H257 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4905
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H222 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H222.pdf |