MA H2224 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4367
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to make provisional employees in civil service positions permanent to those positions. Public Service.
Title
Relative to making provisional employees in civil service positions permanent to those positions
Sponsors
Rep. Tackey Chan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-09 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4367 |
2015-05-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/02/2015 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H4367 (Replaced by) 2016-06-09 - Reported, in part, by H4012
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2224 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2224.pdf |