MA H2260 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5201
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5201
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5201
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to videotaping, audiotaping and photographing persons receiving medical treatment. Public Health.
Title
Relative to videotaping, audiotaping and photographing persons receiving medical treatment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-13 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5201 |
2022-01-13 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2021-10-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/28/2021 from 09:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S685 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H184 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied S115
S1122 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H1765 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H5201 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H184 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied S115
S1122 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H1765 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H5201 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2260 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2260.pdf |