MA H2271 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4722
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the retirement benefits of certain employees of the Department of Transitional Assistance and the Department of Housing and Community Development. Public Service.
Title
Relative to the retirement benefits of certain employees of the Department of Transitional Assistance and the Department of Housing and Community Development
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-20 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4722 |
2019-10-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/12/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H2344 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2223 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H4722 (Replaced by) 2020-05-20 - Reported, in part, by H2169
H2223 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H4722 (Replaced by) 2020-05-20 - Reported, in part, by H2169
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2271 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2271.pdf |