MA H2286 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-3)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to line-of-duty death and survivor benefits for police officers and firefighters. Public Service.
Title
Relative to line-of-duty death and survivor benefits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-03 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2015-05-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/12/2015 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H350 (Similar To) 2016-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4599
H352 (Similar To) 2016-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4601
H2490 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H1267 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H181 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
H352 (Similar To) 2016-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4601
H2490 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H1267 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H181 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2286 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2286.pdf |