MA H229 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a special commission to study women and homelessness. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Establishing a special commission to study women and homelessness
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-03-01 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2022-02-03 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
2021-10-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/15/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
S82 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Recommitted to the committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
S2497 (Similar To) 2021-10-25 - New Draft substituted, see S2561
S812 (Similar To) 2021-11-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4248
H3725 (Similar To) 2022-01-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 8 of the Acts of 2022
H609 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2497 (Similar To) 2021-10-25 - New Draft substituted, see S2561
S812 (Similar To) 2021-11-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4248
H3725 (Similar To) 2022-01-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 8 of the Acts of 2022
H609 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H229 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H229.pdf |