MA H2303 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to change the name of the Department of Probation to the Massachusetts probation service. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Concerning the Massachusetts probation service
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Day [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-15 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-04-11 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 8, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday April 8, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-01-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/23/2024 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
S1532 (Similar To) 2024-05-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2303 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2303.pdf |