MA H2312 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4409
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4409
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4409
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the employment of alien persons who are not documented as being lawfully admitted to the United States. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Relative to the employment of aliens restricted
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Webster [R] | Rep. Geoff Diehl [R] | Sen. Robert Hedlund [R] | Rep. Randy Hunt [R] |
Rep. Steven Levy [R] | Sen. Donald Humason [R] | Sen. John Keenan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-23 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4409 |
2011-11-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/17/2011 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
H4409 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H2312 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=14053&generalCourtId=1 |