MA H2321 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4016
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to regional stabilization funds. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
Relative to regional stabilization funds
Sponsors
Sen. Anne Gobi [D] | Rep. Cleon Turner [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-04 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4016 |
2011-06-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/29/2011 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H4016 (Replaced by) 2012-12-28 - Read third and passed to be engrossed
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H2321 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=13822&generalCourtId=1 |