MA H2337 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2170
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the reclassification of some low level non-violent felonies as misdemeanors. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to the classification and punishment for certain offenses in the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-02 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2170 |
2017-06-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/18/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S770 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
S826 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H3072 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
S2170 (Replaced by) 2017-11-02 - Ways and Means amendment adopted, as amended, see S2185
S826 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H3072 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
S2170 (Replaced by) 2017-11-02 - Ways and Means amendment adopted, as amended, see S2185
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2337 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2337.pdf |