MA H235 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5222
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5222
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5222
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to establishing guardians as providers of medical care to support the rights of incapacitated persons. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Establishing guardians as providers of medical care to support the rights of incapacitated persons
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-15 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5222 |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-03-31 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday June 1, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-02-17 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2021-10-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
S127 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S2471 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H1646 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H1733 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S933 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S949 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H5222 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2471 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H1646 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H1733 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S933 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S949 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H5222 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H235 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H235.pdf |