MA H2369 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3815
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-2)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-11-16 - New draft substituted, see H3815
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-11-16 - New draft substituted, see H3815
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to certified professional midwives and enhancing the practice of nurse-midwives. Public Health.
Title
Relative to enhancing the practice of nurse midwives
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-11-16 | House | New draft substituted, see H3815 |
2011-11-16 | House | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on Health Care Financing) |
2011-11-16 | House | Rules suspended |
2011-11-16 | House | Referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending |
2011-11-16 | House | Committee recommends bill ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a bill with the same title, see H3815 |
2011-08-11 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2011-04-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/12/2011 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H3815 (Replaced by) 2012-02-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 24 of the Acts of 2012
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H2369 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=14267&generalCourtId=1 |