MA H237 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3871
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3871
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3871
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to streamlining home improvement contractor registration. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to streamlining home improvement contractor registration
Sponsors
Sen. John Keenan [D] | Rep. Kimberly Ferguson [R] | Rep. Denise Provost [D] | Rep. Matthew Beaton [R] |
Rep. Tom Sannicandro [D] | Rep. Fred Barrows [R] | Rep. Cory Atkins [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-27 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H3871 |
2014-01-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/21/2014 from 04:00 PM-04:30 PM in A-2 |
2013-06-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/04/2013 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H3871 (Replaced by) 2014-12-18 - New draft substituted, see H4558
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H237 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H237.pdf |