MA H2371 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-11-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-11-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to expanding credible service to certain veterans. Public Service.
Title
Relative to expanding credible service to certain veterans
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-30 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2015-10-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/20/2015 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in 437 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H442 (Similar To) 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4299
H723 (Similar To) 2016-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H4669
H724 (Similar To) 2016-07-21 - New draft substituted, see H4536
H1494 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1495 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H4759 (Similar To) 2016-12-19 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H723 (Similar To) 2016-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H4669
H724 (Similar To) 2016-07-21 - New draft substituted, see H4536
H1494 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1495 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H4759 (Similar To) 2016-12-19 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2371 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2371.pdf |