MA H2383 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3768
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the authority of the Alcoholic Beverages Control Commission over the business of marijuana establishments. Marijuana Policy.
Title
Regarding the authority of the Alcoholic Beverages Control Commission over the business of marijuana establishments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-19 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H3768 |
2017-03-31 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/03/2017 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A1 & A2 |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Marijuana Policy |
Same As/Similar To
S160 (Similar To) 2017-05-09 - Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
S164 (Similar To) 2017-05-22 - Hearing scheduled for 06/06/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
H2380 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
H3176 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
H3191 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
H3167 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
H3768 (Replaced by) 2017-06-21 - Published as amended, see H3776
H25 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4350
S164 (Similar To) 2017-05-22 - Hearing scheduled for 06/06/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
H2380 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
H3176 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
H3191 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
H3167 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
H3768 (Replaced by) 2017-06-21 - Published as amended, see H3776
H25 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4350
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2383 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2383.pdf |