MA H2383 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 217 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 217 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize James S. Armentrout to purchase creditable service from the Barnstable County Retirement Board. Public Service.
Title
Authorizing James S. Armentrout to purchase creditable service from the Barnstable County Retirement Board
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-02 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 217 of the Acts of 2020 | |
2020-11-30 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2020-11-30 | House | Enacted |
2020-11-25 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2020-11-25 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2020-10-13 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2020-10-08 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2019-11-20 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-11-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-11-20 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2019-11-19 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2019-07-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/09/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S1496 (Similar To) 2021-01-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 267 of the Acts of 2020
S1498 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S906 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H3929 (Similar To) 2020-12-22 - New draft substituted, see H5210
S1498 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S906 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H3929 (Similar To) 2020-12-22 - New draft substituted, see H5210
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2383 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2383.pdf |