MA H239 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S100
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-05 - Accompanied S100
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-05 - Accompanied S100
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to exempt certain public water system employees from sprinkler fitters examining and licensing requirments. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
To maintain public water systems
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-05 | Senate | Accompanied S100 |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-04-29 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday June 03, 2014, pending concurrence |
2013-05-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2013 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
S100 (Replaced by) 2014-12-18 - New draft substituted, see S2415
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H239 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H239.pdf |