MA H2391 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5040
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to encourage employee student loan assistance. Revenue.
Title
Encouraging employer student loan repayment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-15 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5040 |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-04-09 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday June 16, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-02-06 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday April 7, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-07-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H2394 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H3391 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1689 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
H2450 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
S1681 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H5040 (Replaced by) 2020-10-15 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H3391 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1689 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
H2450 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
S1681 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H5040 (Replaced by) 2020-10-15 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2391 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2391.pdf |