MA H2392 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4469
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4469
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4469
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Westford be authorized to establish a means tested senior citizen property tax exemption. Revenue. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Westford to establish a means tested senior citizen property tax exemption
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4469 |
2019-09-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H2481 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H2542 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2634 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2470 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied H2477
H2981 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H3694 (Similar To) 2019-10-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 100 of the Acts of 2019
H3995 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4476
H4081 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4477
H4243 (Similar To) 2020-03-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 50 of the Acts of 2020
H4469 (Replaced by) 2021-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 314 of the Acts of 2020
H2542 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2634 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2470 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied H2477
H2981 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H3694 (Similar To) 2019-10-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 100 of the Acts of 2019
H3995 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4476
H4081 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4477
H4243 (Similar To) 2020-03-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 50 of the Acts of 2020
H4469 (Replaced by) 2021-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 314 of the Acts of 2020
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2392 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2392.pdf |