MA H2413 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide the next of kin of a state police officer killed in the line of duty with a flag during the memorial service. Public Service.
Title
Relative to providing the next of kin of a state police officer killed in the line of duty with a flag during the memorial service
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-03 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2015-05-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/12/2015 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H3286 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H2827 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H3086 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H954 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H2412 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H2827 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H3086 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H954 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H2412 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2413 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2413.pdf |