MA H2413 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5128
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish an historic building fire prevention tax credit. Revenue.
Title
To protect historic buildings from fires
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-19 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5128 |
2019-09-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H2627 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2624 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2629 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S1767 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4465
S1761 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4467
S1706 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H5128 (Replaced by) 2020-11-19 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2624 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2629 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S1767 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4465
S1761 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4467
S1706 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H5128 (Replaced by) 2020-11-19 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2413 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2413.pdf |