MA H242 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4724
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4724
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4724
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a special commission to study the current refugee resettlement infrastructure and ensure the successful integration of refugees in Massachusetts. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Creating a special commission to study the current refugee resettlement infrastructure and ensure the successful integration of refugees in Massachusetts
Sponsors
Rep. David LeBoeuf [D] | Rep. Vanna Howard [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D] | Sen. James Eldridge [D] |
Rep. Natalie Higgins [D] | Rep. Tommy Vitolo [D] | Rep. Danillo Sena [D] | Rep. Marcos Devers [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4724 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-01-27 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday May 2, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-01-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/18/2022 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
S2044 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
H4724 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4724 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H242 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H242.pdf |