MA H2455 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4109
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4109
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4109
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to prohibit the sale of tobacco products at certain health care institutions. Public Health.
Title
Restricting the sale of tobacco products at health care institutions
Sponsors
Rep. Sean Garballey [D] | Rep. Steven Ultrino [D] | Sen. Michael Barrett [D] | Rep. Lori Ehrlich [D] |
Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D] | Rep. Brian Ashe [D] | Rep. Thomas Stanley [D] | Sen. Patricia Jehlen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-11 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4109 |
2017-05-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S1188 (Similar To) 2018-03-19 - Accompanied S1218
S1576 (Similar To) 2017-11-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3998
S1189 (Similar To) 2018-03-19 - Accompanied S1218
S1218 (Similar To) 2018-06-21 - Accompanied H4486
H2864 (Similar To) 2018-01-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4109
H4109 (Replaced by) 2018-05-09 - New draft substituted, see H4479
S1576 (Similar To) 2017-11-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3998
S1189 (Similar To) 2018-03-19 - Accompanied S1218
S1218 (Similar To) 2018-06-21 - Accompanied H4486
H2864 (Similar To) 2018-01-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4109
H4109 (Replaced by) 2018-05-09 - New draft substituted, see H4479
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2455 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2455.pdf |