MA H246 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a subsidiary board for veterinary technology under the Board of Registration in Veterinary Medicine. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
To establish a subsidiary board for veterinary technology
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2014-03-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/18/2014 from 03:00 PM-03:30 PM in A-1 |
2014-01-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/28/2014 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-1 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H246 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H246.pdf |