MA H2465 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4574
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-5)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4574
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4574
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to providing protections for health care employees who are victims of violence or assault and battery. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Requiring health care employers to develop and implement programs to prevent workplace violence
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-09 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4574 |
2021-07-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/21/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
H4574 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2465 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2465.pdf |