MA H2487 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4486
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-11-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H4486
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-11-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H4486
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to health insurance for certain early education and care providers and their employees. Public Service.
Title
Relative to health insurance for early education and care providers and their employees
Sponsors
Rep. Martin Walsh [D] | Rep. Kay Khan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-11-01 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4486 |
2011-05-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/07/2011 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred. |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Service. |
2011-01-20 | House | Bill Filed. |
Same As/Similar To
H4486 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H2487 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=13870&generalCourtId=1 |