MA H2488 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4639
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to information included with municipal tax bills. Revenue.
Title
Relative to information included with municipal tax bills
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-26 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4639 |
2015-05-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/12/2015 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H4639 (Replaced by) 2016-09-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2488 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2488.pdf |