MA H25 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 2 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 2 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the Massachusetts State Lottery Commission So much of the recommendations of the Department of the State Treasurer (House, No. 17) as relates to the Massachusetts State Lottery Commission. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to the Massachusetts State Lottery Commission
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-10 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2014-03-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/18/2014 from 03:00 PM-03:30 PM in A-1 |
2014-01-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/28/2014 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-1 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-02 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H25 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H25.pdf |