MA H2507 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the retirement benefits of special investigators of the Alcohol Beverage Control Commission. Public Service.
Title
Relative to special investigators of the alcohol beverage control commission
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Donato [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-02 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-08 | House | Reporting date extended to Sunday June 30, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-04-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/02/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S2769 (Similar To) 2024-06-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4826 (Similar To) 2024-07-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4927
H4826 (Similar To) 2024-07-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4927
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2507 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2507.pdf |