MA H2517 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-3)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the taxation of trucks, tractors, trailers and railcars that transport people or goods in interstate commerce. Revenue.
Title
Relative to the taxation of rolling stock
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2020-03-04 | House | Accompanied by S1759 |
2019-05-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S1759 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Accompanied H2517
S1723 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5031
S1714 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2539 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2540 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
S1723 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5031
S1714 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2539 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2540 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2517 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2517.pdf |