MA H2519 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H2564
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-16 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-16 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to providing a property tax exemption for certain paraplegic veterans. Revenue.
Title
Providing for an exemption for certain paraplegic veterans
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-16 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-04-15 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2014-03-20 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2014-03-20 | House | Accompanied by H2564 |
2013-06-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2013 from 09:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H2564 (Replaces) 2014-03-20 - Accompanied H2519
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H2519 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H2519.pdf |