MA H252 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4462
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4462
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4462
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to financial exploitation of certain adults with disabilities. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Protecting vulnerable adults from financial exploitation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-22 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4462 |
2021-12-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/04/2022 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
H1660 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S1073 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H4462 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1073 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H4462 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H252 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H252.pdf |