MA H2531 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to directing the State Retirement Board to pay a certain retirement benefit to Virginia Wise, the surviving spouse of Raymond Wise, an officer of the Bridgewater State College Police Department. Public Service.
Title
Directing the State Board of Retirement to grant certain retirement benefits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2017-12-11 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2017-07-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/13/2017 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H3279 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4260
S2147 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
H4915 (Similar To) 2018-10-11 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4928
H4928 (Similar To) 2018-11-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 289 of the Acts of 2018
S2147 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
H4915 (Similar To) 2018-10-11 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4928
H4928 (Similar To) 2018-11-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 289 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2531 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2531.pdf |