MA H254 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-16 - Report accepted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-16 - Report accepted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to providing complete repair and diagnostic information to motor vehicle owners and automotive businesses in the repair of motor vehicles. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Providing complete repair and diagnostic information to motor vehicle owners and automotive businesses in the repair of motor vehicles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-16 | House | Report accepted |
2014-06-10 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance |
2014-05-19 | House | Committee recommended ought NOT to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2014-03-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/18/2014 from 03:00 PM-03:30 PM in A-1 |
2013-07-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2013 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H254 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H254.pdf |