MA H2541 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4010
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4010
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4010
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to property tax exemptions for renewable power systems. Revenue.
Title
Relative to property tax exemptions for renewable power systems
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Kaufman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-28 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4010 |
2011-10-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/20/2011 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in A-2 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H4010 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H2541 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=14318&generalCourtId=1 |