MA H2546 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-14 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-14 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the feasibility of simplifying the personal income tax code. Revenue.
Title
Relative to creating a commission to study the feasibility of simplifying the personal income tax code
Sponsors
Rep. Randy Hunt [R] | Rep. David DeCoste [R] | Rep. Mathew Muratore [R] | Rep. Timothy Whelan [R] |
Rep. Jonathan Zlotnik [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-14 | House | Discharged to the committee on House Rules |
2015-05-07 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
2015-05-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/07/2015 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2546 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2546.pdf |