MA H2546 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the availability of personal floatation devices at swimming pools of certain municipal and recreational programs and camps. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Relative to the availability of personal floatation devices at certain municipal and recreational programs and camps
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-05-17 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2022-03-17 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2021-07-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/21/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2546 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2546.pdf |