MA H255 | 2009-2010 | 186th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-07-28 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-07-28 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the permitting of barber schools and the licensing requirements for barber instructors
Title
The permitting of barber schools and the licensing requirements for barber instructors
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-28 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | |
2009-07-27 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading | |
2009-06-19 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House Committee On Steering, Policy and Scheduling | |
2009-01-20 | Public Hearing date 4/7 at 11:00 AM in Hearing Room B-2 | |
2009-01-20 | Senate concurred | |
2009-01-20 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.mass.gov/legis/186history/h00255.htm |
Text | http://www.mass.gov/legis/bills/house/186/ht00/ht00255.htm |