MA H2551 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H2565
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 247 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 247 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the taxation of forest, farm and recreational land. Revenue.
Title
Making corrective changes in certain laws regarding the taxation of forest, farm and recreational land
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-06 | House | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 247 of the Acts of 2014 |
2014-07-31 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2014-07-31 | House | Enacted |
2014-07-31 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-07-31 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-07-31 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2014-03-17 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2013-05-15 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2013-05-13 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2013-05-09 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2013-05-09 | House | Accompanied by H2565 |
2013-04-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/09/2013 from 09:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H2565 (Replaces) 2013-05-14 - Accompanied H2551
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H2551 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H2551.pdf |