MA H2572 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4639
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to grant the State Auditor access to certain confidential tax information for use in auditing tax expenditures. Revenue.
Title
Relative to access to tax expenditure information
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Kaufman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-26 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4639 |
2015-08-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/22/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H4639 (Replaced by) 2016-09-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H573 (Similar To) 2015-05-11 - Placed on file
H574 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H575 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H576 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H3178 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Senate concurred
H573 (Similar To) 2015-05-11 - Placed on file
H574 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H575 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H576 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H3178 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Senate concurred
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2572 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2572.pdf |