MA H2578 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4437
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4437
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4437
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to repeal the law requiring homeowners to submit certain information to local boards of assessors concerning the valuation of property. Revenue.
Title
Relative to the assessment of local taxes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-02 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4437 |
2013-06-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/28/2013 from 10:30 AM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H4437 (Replaced by) 2014-11-13 - Reported, in part, by H3537
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H2578 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H2578.pdf |