MA H260 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the administration of the personal care attendant program by the Division of Medical Assistance. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Relative to cueing and supervision in the PCA program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-05-05 | House | Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2022-05-05 | House | Accompanied by S129 |
2022-02-14 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2021-12-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/04/2022 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
S129 (Similar To) 2022-05-05 - Accompanied H260
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H260 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H260.pdf |