MA H2603 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4960
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to grant creditable service time for Massachusetts National Guard service. Public Service.
Title
Requiring creditable service for Massachusetts National Guard service
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-05 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4960 |
2021-08-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/01/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H2666 (Similar To) 2021-06-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3853
S1770 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S2425 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1751 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1778 (Similar To) 2021-12-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4960 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1770 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S2425 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1751 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1778 (Similar To) 2021-12-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4960 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2603 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2603.pdf |